Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 939 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 6283 Week
» 7173 Month
» 315154 Year
» 1199535 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 34104 m/e 04/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer O. Bulleid
Class West Country/Battle of Britain
Company History SR
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Air Smoothed04/1950
Rebuilt05/1961
Wheels 4-6-2
Builder Eastleigh Works
To Service During 04/1950
Withdrawal w/e Sun 25/06/1967
Scrapping During 10/1967
Service Life 17 yrs, 2 mths , 25 dys
Information Rebuilt Eastleigh May 1961

Allocations
Code Name From Date
74C Dover Marine 3w/e 17/11/1956
72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 24/02/1958
71A Eastleigh m/e 09/11/1961
   Withdrawn w/e 25/06/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 73A Stewarts Lane 7w/e 22/04/1950
NEW 73A Stewarts Lane 2w/e 20/05/1950
TOSTORE   3w/e 30/11/1950
REINS 73A Stewarts Lane 6w/e 14/03/1951
TOSTORE 73A Stewarts Lane 9w/e 31/10/1954
REINS 73A Stewarts Lane 4w/e 11/12/1954
ALLOC 74C Dover Marine P 31/10/1956
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction 6w/e 24/02/1958
ALLOC 71A Eastleigh 4w/e 09/11/1961
WDN   w/e 25/06/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1950 To Service To service as BR Number 34104
Built at Eastleigh Works
   
17/11/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Dover (74C)    
24/02/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
09/11/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A)    
23/10/1966 Sightings Salisbury depot: On shed RO 12/1966 Link
06/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 34104    

prev prev