Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 163 Today
» 960 Yesterday
» 2070 Week
» 20852 Month
» 269145 Year
» 1153526 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 34105 m/e 03/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer O. Bulleid
Class West Country/Battle of Britain
Company History SR
Wheels 4-6-2
Builder Brighton Works
To Service During 03/1950
Withdrawal w/e Sun 04/10/1964
Service Life 14 yrs, 7 mths , 6 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
70D Eastleigh m/e 14/09/1964
   Withdrawn w/e 04/10/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 71B Bournemouth 4w/e 04/03/1950
TOSTORE 71B Bournemouth 5w/e 08/10/1951
REINS 71B Bournemouth w/e 06/12/1951
ALLOC 70D Eastleigh 4w/e 14/09/1964
WDN   w/e 04/10/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status Unknown
Status Date 17/09/2018


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1950 To Service To service as BR Number 34105
Built at Brighton Works
   
14/09/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (70D)    
10/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 34105    

prev prev