Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 1353 Today
» 1394 Yesterday
» 6520 Week
» 6520 Month
» 195655 Year
» 1417220 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 34107 m/e 04/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer O. Bulleid
Class West Country/Battle of Britain
Company History SR
Wheels 4-6-2
Builder Brighton Works
To Service During 04/1950
Withdrawal 3w/e Mon 14/09/1964
Scrapping During 12/1964
Service Life 14 yrs, 5 mths , 14 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 04/1950
72A Exmouth Junction 6w/e 14/06/1959
   Withdrawn 3w/e 14/09/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 71B Bournemouth 7w/e 22/04/1950
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction P 14/06/1959
WDN   3w/e 14/09/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
12/05/1963 Eastleigh Works Erecting Shop: D3223, D3721, D6522/34/64, E5005/9, 11229 (to be renumbered D2259), DS680, 30828/42, 31621/39, 31859/62, 34001/10/22/4/5/53/76/95, 34104/7/9, 35003, 41224, 76008/18, 80013, 80138/43. Works Yard: D3044, D3462, D6523, 30545, 31411, 31834, 32104/9, 32635/61, 33004/26, 34096, 80032. Scrap Yard: 30039, 30517/33, 30937, 31891. Test House: 33020. SLS/196304


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1950 To Service To service as British Railways Number 34107
Built at Brighton Works
   
14/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
14/09/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 34107    

prev prev