Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 281 Today
» 960 Yesterday
» 2188 Week
» 20970 Month
» 269263 Year
» 1153644 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 34108 m/e 04/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer O. Bulleid
Class West Country/Battle of Britain
Company History SR
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Air Smoothed04/1950
Rebuilt05/1961
Wheels 4-6-2
Builder Brighton Works
To Service During 04/1950
Withdrawal w/e Sun 25/06/1967
Scrapping During 10/1967
Service Life 17 yrs, 2 mths , 25 dys
Information Rebuilt Eastleigh Apr 1961

Allocations
Code Name From Date
72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 24/02/1958
70E Salisbury m/e 11/11/1963
   Withdrawn w/e 25/06/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 71B Bournemouth 7w/e 22/04/1950
NEW 71B Bournemouth 2w/e 20/05/1950
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction 6w/e 24/02/1958
ALLOC 91S To Southern Region 5w/e 02/11/1963
ALLOC 70E Salisbury 4w/e 11/11/1963
WDN   w/e 25/06/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1950 To Service To service as BR Number 34108
Built at Brighton Works
   
20/07/1954 Sightings Eastleigh Works Arrivals: Period under review. RO 9/1954 Link
24/02/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
11/11/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Salisbury (70E)    
23/10/1966 Sightings Salisbury depot: On shed RO 12/1966 Link
06/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 34108    

prev prev