Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 190 Today
» 1091 Yesterday
» 190 Week
» 18972 Month
» 267265 Year
» 1151646 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 34109 m/e 05/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer O. Bulleid
Class West Country/Battle of Britain
Company History SR
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Air Smoothed05/1950
Rebuilt03/1961
Wheels 4-6-2
Builder Brighton Works
To Service During 05/1950
Withdrawal 3w/e Mon 14/09/1964
Scrapping During 12/1966
Service Life 14 yrs, 4 mths , 15 dys
Information Rebuilt Eastleigh Mar 1961

Allocations
Code Name From Date
72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 24/02/1958
72A Exmouth Junction 7w/e 23/08/1961
   Withdrawn 3w/e 14/09/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 71B Bournemouth 3w/e 10/06/1950
TOSTORE   3w/e 30/11/1950
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction 6w/e 24/02/1958
WDN   3w/e 14/09/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1950 To Service To service as BR Number 34109
Built at Brighton Works
   
24/02/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
23/08/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
09/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 34109    

prev prev