Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 26 Online
» 2439 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15845 Week
» 68861 Month
» 188388 Year
» 3215241 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway |
21C2 |
m/e |
06/1941 |
British Railways |
35002 |
m/e |
01/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
O. Bulleid |
Class |
Merchant Navy |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
4-6-2 |
Builder |
Eastleigh Works |
To Service |
During 06/1941 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sun 23/02/1964 |
Service Life |
22 yrs, 8 mths , 23 dys |
Total Mileage |
1,101,914 |
Information |
Rebuilt Eastleigh Sep 1958 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 12/1964 |
Tenders
Type |
Number |
From |
Company |
Water |
Coal |
MN Series 1 |
3112 |
05/1941 |
SR |
5,000g |
5t 0cwt |
MN Series 1 |
3115 |
03/1952 |
SR |
5,000g |
5t 0cwt |
MN Series 1 |
3112 |
03/1952 |
SR |
5,000g |
5t 0cwt |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
01/1954 |
Original cab replaced with revised model |
05/1958 |
Rebuild - streamline casing removed, chain valve gear replaced with Walschaerts etc... |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1941 |
Tender |
Tender fitted: MN Series 1 number 3112 |
|
|
06/1941 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 21C2 Built at Eastleigh Works |
|
|
04/07/1941 |
Naming |
Named 'UNION CASTLE' |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Exmouth Junction (EXJ) |
|
|
01/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 35002 |
|
|
03/1952 |
Tender |
Tender fitted: MN Series 1 number 3112 |
|
|
03/1952 |
Tender |
Tender fitted: MN Series 1 number 3115 |
|
|
01/1954 |
Modification |
Modification: Original cab replaced with revised model |
|
|
13/05/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bournemouth (71B) |
|
|
18/06/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A) |
|
|
05/1958 |
Modification |
Modification: Rebuild - streamline casing removed, chain valve gear replaced with Walschaerts etc... |
|
|
06/06/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bournemouth (71B) |
|
|
24/11/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A) |
|
|
17/01/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bournemouth (71B) |
|
|
27/01/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A) |
|
|
23/02/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 35002 |
|
|
12/1964 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|