Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 9 Online
» 198 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18001 Week
» 71017 Month
» 190544 Year
» 3217397 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway |
21C3 |
m/e |
09/1941 |
British Railways |
35003 |
m/e |
06/1948 |
Names Carried
Date From |
Name |
24/10/1941 |
ROYAL MAIL |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
O. Bulleid |
Class |
Merchant Navy |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
4-6-2 |
Builder |
Eastleigh Works |
To Service |
During 09/1941 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sun 09/07/1967 |
Service Life |
25 yrs, 10 mths , 8 dys |
Total Mileage |
1,131,793 |
Information |
Rebuilt Eastleigh Sep 1959 |
Tenders
Type |
Number |
From |
Company |
Water |
Coal |
MN Series 1 |
3113 |
09/1941 |
SR |
5,000g |
5t 0cwt |
MN Series 1 |
3117 |
02/1944 |
SR |
5,000g |
5t 0cwt |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
05/1950 |
Original cab replaced with revised model |
08/1959 |
Rebuild - streamline casing removed, chain valve gear replaced with Walschaerts etc... |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1941 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 21C3 Built at Eastleigh Works Tender fitted: MN Series 1 |
|
|
24/10/1941 |
Naming |
Named 'ROYAL MAIL' |
|
|
02/1944 |
Tender |
Tender fitted: MN Series 1 number 3117 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Exmouth Junction (EXJ) |
|
|
06/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 35003 |
|
|
05/1950 |
Modification |
Modification: Original cab replaced with revised model |
|
|
08/1959 |
Modification |
Modification: Rebuild - streamline casing removed, chain valve gear replaced with Walschaerts etc... |
|
|
14/06/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A) |
|
|
14/09/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bournemouth (70F) |
|
|
17/10/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Weymouth Radipole (GWR) (70G) |
|
|
17/04/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A) |
|
|
09/07/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 35003 |
|
|
12/1967 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |
|
|