Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 123 Today
» 843 Yesterday
» 2706 Week
» 19655 Month
» 133916 Year
» 1018297 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3473 10/12/1957

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 10
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
To Service 10/12/1957
Withdrawn 27/07/1968
Time in Service 10 yrs, 7 mths , 17 dys
Cut Up 01/01/1969
Cut At C F Booth (Rotherham)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
35A New England (New) 10/12/1957
34A Kings Cross 4w/e 08/01/1958
36A Doncaster w/e 28/11/1959
16A Toton w/e 12/11/1966
   Withdrawn 27/07/1968

Components
Fitted Component Details Removed Reason Removed
10/12/1957 Power Unit ER80577    


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
10/12/1957 To Service To service as D3473
Built at Darlington Works
Allocated to New England (35A)
   
08/01/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A)    
28/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
12/11/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Toton (16A)    
27/07/1968 Withdrawn Condemned as D3473    
01/01/1969 Scrapped Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham    

prev prev