Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 112 Today
» 909 Yesterday
» 112 Week
» 21953 Month
» 217407 Year
» 1101788 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3474 11/12/1957

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 10
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Cost when Built £
To Service 11/12/1957
Withdrawn 30/06/1968
Time in Service 10 yrs, 6 mths , 19 dys
Cut Up 01/01/1969
Cut At C F Booth (Rotherham)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
35A New England (New) 11/12/1957
34A Kings Cross 4w/e 08/01/1958
36A Doncaster w/e 28/11/1959
   Withdrawn 30/06/1968

Components
Fitted Component Details Removed Reason Removed
11/12/1957 Power Unit ER80578    


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
11/12/1957 To Service To service as D3474
Built at Darlington Works
Allocated to New England (35A)
   
08/01/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A)    
28/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
02/12/1961 Sightings Doncaster Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop. SLS 1/1962 Link
02/12/1961 Sightings Doncaster Works visit: Around the Works - New erecting shop. SLS 1/1962 Link
30/06/1968 Withdrawn Condemned as D3474    
01/01/1969 Scrapped Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham    

prev prev