Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 166 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17969 Week
» 70985 Month
» 190512 Year
» 3217365 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3474 |
11/12/1957 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
11/12/1957 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
Components
Fitted |
Component |
Details |
Removed |
Reason Removed |
11/12/1957 |
Power Unit ER80578 |
|
|
|
|
Works Visits
Where Repaired |
Date Stopped |
Days Since Last Stopped |
Works Entry |
Departure |
Class of Repair |
Waiting Repair Decision |
Waiting Works |
On Works |
Total Duration |
Cost of Repair |
Mileage |
Notes |
Doncaster Works |
|
n/a |
16/11/1961 |
12/01/1962 |
General |
|
|
|
58 days |
|
22,070 |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/12/1957 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3474 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to New England (35A) |
|
|
05/01/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) |
|
|
28/11/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) |
|
|
16/11/1961 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/11/1961. Dep: 12/01/1962. |
|
|
30/06/1968 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 3474 |
|
|
01/1969 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|