Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 124 Today
» 843 Yesterday
» 2707 Week
» 19656 Month
» 133917 Year
» 1018298 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3475 18/12/1957

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 10
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
To Service 18/12/1957
Withdrawn 13/07/1968
Time in Service 10 yrs, 6 mths , 25 dys
Cut Up 01/01/1969
Cut At C F Booth (Rotherham)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
35A New England (New) 18/12/1957
34A Kings Cross 4w/e 08/01/1958
34C Hatfield w/e 14/03/1959
40B Immingham w/e 16/07/1960
41A Sheffield Darnall w/e 02/03/1963
41B Sheffield Darnall w/e 02/05/1964
41A Tinsley w/e 09/10/1965
16A Toton w/e 12/11/1966
   Withdrawn 13/07/1968

Components
Fitted Component Details Removed Reason Removed
18/12/1957 Power Unit ER80601    


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
18/12/1957 To Service To service as D3475
Built at Darlington Works
Allocated to New England (35A)
   
08/01/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A)    
14/03/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Hatfield (34C)    
16/07/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
02/03/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A)    
02/05/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41B)    
09/10/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
12/11/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Toton (16A)    
13/07/1968 Withdrawn Condemned as D3475    
01/01/1969 Scrapped Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham    

prev prev