Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 13 Today
» 1241 Yesterday
» 6859 Week
» 18406 Month
» 418088 Year
» 494675 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3476 24/12/1957

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 10
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
To Service 24/12/1957
Withdrawn 01/06/1968
Time in Service 10 yrs, 5 mths , 8 dys
Cut Up 01/03/2009
Cut At T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
34A Kings Cross (New) 24/12/1957
34C Hatfield 4w/e 08/01/1958
34D Hitchin (GNR) w/e 07/01/1961
41A Sheffield Darnall w/e 22/04/1961
36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) w/e 04/08/1962
40A Lincoln w/e 19/06/1965
41J Shirebrook w/e 02/04/1966
16A Toton w/e 03/09/1966
16B Colwick w/e 11/11/1967
16A Toton w/e 16/12/1967
   Withdrawn 01/06/1968

Components
Fitted Component Details Removed Reason Removed
24/12/1957 Power Unit ER81659    

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
24/12/1957 To Service To service as D3476
Built at Darlington Works
Allocated to Kings Cross (34A)
   
08/01/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Hatfield (34C)    
07/01/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Hitchin (GNR) (34D)    
22/04/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A)    
04/08/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    
19/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (40A)    
02/04/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Shirebrook (41J)    
03/09/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Toton (16A)    
11/11/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (16B)    
16/12/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Toton (16A)    
01/06/1968 Withdrawn Condemned as D3476    
01/03/2009 Scrapped Broken up by T J Thomson and Son Ltd.: Stockton    

prev prev