Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 123 Today
» 843 Yesterday
» 2706 Week
» 19655 Month
» 133916 Year
» 1018297 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3477 31/12/1957

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 10
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
To Service 31/12/1957
Withdrawn 14/07/1968
Time in Service 10 yrs, 6 mths , 13 dys
Cut Up 01/01/1969
Cut At Cohens (Kettering)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
34A Kings Cross (New) 31/12/1957
34C Hatfield 4w/e 08/01/1958
34D Hitchin (GNR) w/e 07/01/1961
40B Immingham w/e 29/04/1961
30A Stratford w/e 06/05/1967
   Withdrawn 14/07/1968

Components
Fitted Component Details Removed Reason Removed
31/12/1957 Power Unit ER81658    


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
31/12/1957 To Service To service as D3477
Built at Darlington Works
Allocated to Kings Cross (34A)
   
08/01/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Hatfield (34C)    
07/01/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Hitchin (GNR) (34D)    
29/04/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
02/12/1961 Sightings Doncaster Works visit: Around the Works - New erecting shop. SLS 1/1962 Link
06/05/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
14/07/1968 Withdrawn Condemned as D3477    
01/01/1969 Scrapped Broken up by Cohens: Kettering    

prev prev