Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 141 Today
» 909 Yesterday
» 141 Week
» 21982 Month
» 217436 Year
» 1101817 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3482 28/02/1958

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 10
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Cost when Built £
To Service 28/02/1958
Withdrawn 22/06/1968
Time in Service 10 yrs, 3 mths , 25 dys
Cut Up 01/01/1969
Cut At C F Booth (Rotherham)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
36A Doncaster (New) 28/02/1958
16A Toton w/e 12/11/1966
   Withdrawn 22/06/1968

Components
Fitted Component Details Removed Reason Removed
28/02/1958 Power Unit ER81976    


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
28/02/1958 To Service To service as D3482
Built at Darlington Works
Allocated to Doncaster (36A)
   
26/02/1961 Sightings Doncaster Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop.   Link
12/11/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Toton (16A)    
22/06/1968 Withdrawn Condemned as D3482    
01/01/1969 Scrapped Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham    

prev prev