Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 102 Today
» 924 Yesterday
» 3497 Week
» 19476 Month
» 214930 Year
» 1099311 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3483 05/03/1958

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 10
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Cost when Built £
To Service 05/03/1958
Withdrawn 15/03/1969
Time in Service 11 yrs , 10 dys
Cut Up 01/10/1969
Cut At Cohens (Kettering)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
36A Doncaster (New) 05/03/1958
   Withdrawn 15/03/1969

Components
Fitted Component Details Removed Reason Removed
05/03/1958 Power Unit ER80664    


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
05/03/1958 To Service To service as D3483
Built at Darlington Works
Allocated to Doncaster (36A)
   
15/03/1969 Withdrawn Condemned as D3483    
20/09/1969 Sightings Noted in Carlisle Kingmoor Yard: Dead RO489 11/69 Link
01/10/1969 Scrapped Broken up by Cohens: Kettering    

prev prev