Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 112 Today
» 909 Yesterday
» 112 Week
» 21953 Month
» 217407 Year
» 1101788 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3485 11/03/1958

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 10
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Cost when Built £
To Service 11/03/1958
Withdrawn 15/12/1968
Time in Service 10 yrs, 9 mths , 4 dys
Cut Up 01/06/1969
Cut At Cohens (Kettering)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
35A New England (New) 11/03/1958
31B March w/e 14/09/1968
   Withdrawn 15/12/1968

Components
Fitted Component Details Removed Reason Removed
11/03/1958 Power Unit ER80732    


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
11/03/1958 To Service To service as D3485
Built at Darlington Works
Allocated to New England (35A)
   
14/09/1968 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
15/12/1968 Withdrawn Condemned as D3485    
01/06/1969 Scrapped Broken up by Cohens: Kettering    

prev prev