Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 139 Today
» 909 Yesterday
» 139 Week
» 21980 Month
» 217434 Year
» 1101815 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3486 19/03/1958

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 10
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Cost when Built £
To Service 19/03/1958
Withdrawn 14/11/1970
Time in Service 12 yrs, 7 mths , 26 dys
Cut Up 01/04/1971
Cut At C F Booth (Rotherham)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
34E New England (New) 19/03/1958
31B March w/e 26/10/1968
   Withdrawn 14/11/1970

Components
Fitted Component Details Removed Reason Removed
19/03/1958 Power Unit ER80748    


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
19/03/1958 To Service To service as D3486
Built at Darlington Works
Allocated to New England (34E)
   
26/10/1968 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
14/11/1970 Withdrawn Condemned as D3486    
01/04/1971 Scrapped Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham    

prev prev