Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 684 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18487 Week
» 71503 Month
» 191030 Year
» 3217883 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3487 |
21/03/1958 |
|
|
Allocations - WIP
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
34E |
|
New England (New) |
on |
21/03/1958 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
14/07/1968 |
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
21/03/1958 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
Components
Fitted |
Component |
Details |
Removed |
Reason Removed |
21/03/1958 |
Power Unit ER80792 |
|
|
|
|
Works Visits
Where Repaired |
Date Stopped |
Days Since Last Stopped |
Works Entry |
Departure |
Class of Repair |
Waiting Repair Decision |
Waiting Works |
On Works |
Total Duration |
Cost of Repair |
Mileage |
Notes |
Doncaster Works |
|
n/a |
09/12/1960 |
22/12/1960 |
Light Casual |
|
|
|
14 days |
|
|
|
Doncaster Works |
|
n/a |
14/04/1961 |
16/05/1961 |
Light Casual |
|
|
|
33 days |
|
|
|
Doncaster Works |
|
n/a |
17/08/1961 |
15/09/1961 |
Light Casual |
|
|
|
30 days |
|
|
|
Doncaster Works |
|
n/a |
27/12/1961 |
15/02/1962 |
General |
|
|
|
51 days |
|
29,610 |
|
Doncaster Works |
|
n/a |
30/03/1962 |
13/04/1962 |
Heavy Casual |
|
|
|
15 days |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
21/03/1958 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3487 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to New England (34E) |
|
|
09/12/1960 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 09/12/1960. Dep: 22/12/1960. |
|
|
14/04/1961 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 14/04/1961. Dep: 16/05/1961. |
|
|
17/08/1961 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 17/08/1961. Dep: 15/09/1961. |
|
|
27/12/1961 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/12/1961. Dep: 15/02/1962. |
|
|
30/03/1962 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 30/03/1962. Dep: 13/04/1962. |
|
|
14/07/1968 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 3487 |
|
|
05/1969 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|