Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 4253 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17659 Week
» 70675 Month
» 190202 Year
» 3217055 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3488 |
27/03/1958 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
27/03/1958 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
Components
Fitted |
Component |
Details |
Removed |
Reason Removed |
27/03/1958 |
Power Unit ER80793 |
|
|
|
|
Works Visits
Where Repaired |
Date Stopped |
Days Since Last Stopped |
Works Entry |
Departure |
Class of Repair |
Waiting Repair Decision |
Waiting Works |
On Works |
Total Duration |
Cost of Repair |
Mileage |
Notes |
Darlington Works |
|
n/a |
08/09/1958 |
14/11/1958 |
Light Casual |
|
|
|
68 days |
|
|
|
Doncaster Works |
|
n/a |
19/02/1960 |
13/05/1960 |
Light Casual |
|
|
|
85 days |
|
|
|
Doncaster Works |
|
n/a |
18/09/1962 |
24/10/1962 |
General |
|
|
|
37 days |
|
33,787 |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
27/03/1958 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3488 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to New England (34E) |
|
|
08/09/1958 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 08/09/1958. Dep: 14/11/1958. |
|
|
19/02/1960 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 19/02/1960. Dep: 13/05/1960. |
|
|
18/09/1962 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/09/1962. Dep: 24/10/1962. |
|
|
20/10/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
08/12/1968 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 3488 |
|
|
06/1969 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cohens: Kettering |
|
|