Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 1353 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19156 Week
» 72172 Month
» 191699 Year
» 3218552 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D349 |
14/06/1961 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
40149 |
08/12/1973 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
All over Green including front of cab |
14/06/1961 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 12/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
19/12/1970 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
12/10/1976 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
14/06/1961 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
19/12/1970 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
12/10/1976 |
xi |
Dual brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
08/09/1964 |
Not severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
14/06/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D349 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 3095 Allocated to York (North) (50A) Livery applied: All over Green including front of cab |
|
|
08/10/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Healey Mills (56B) |
|
|
12/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
19/12/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
10/03/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
08/12/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 40149 |
|
|
12/10/1976 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
23/08/1981 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 40149 from Healey Mills (HM) |
|
|
05/1986 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|