Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 139 Today
» 909 Yesterday
» 139 Week
» 21980 Month
» 217434 Year
» 1101815 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3491 16/04/1958

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 10
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Cost when Built £
To Service 16/04/1958
Withdrawn 17/12/1968
Time in Service 10 yrs, 8 mths , 1 dy
Cut Up 01/06/1969
Cut At Cohens (Kettering)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
31B March (New) 16/04/1958
34E New England w/e 29/10/1966
31B March w/e 26/10/1968
   Withdrawn 17/12/1968

Components
Fitted Component Details Removed Reason Removed
16/04/1958 Power Unit ER80972    


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
16/04/1958 To Service To service as D3491
Built at Darlington Works
Allocated to March (31B)
   
29/10/1966 Allocation Reallocated to New England (34E)    
26/10/1968 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
17/12/1968 Withdrawn Condemned as D3491    
01/06/1969 Scrapped Broken up by Cohens: Kettering    
01/09/1969 Sightings At Cohen's scrapyard, Kettering: In scrapyard RO489 11/69 Link

prev prev