Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 124 Today
» 843 Yesterday
» 2707 Week
» 19656 Month
» 133917 Year
» 1018298 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3494 01/05/1958

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 10
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
To Service 01/05/1958
Withdrawn 26/05/1968
Time in Service 10 yrs , 25 dys
Cut Up 01/01/1969
Cut At Cohens (Kettering)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
31B March (New) 01/05/1958
34E New England w/e 07/11/1964
30A Stratford w/e 10/09/1966
30F Parkeston Quay w/e 10/12/1966
30E Colchester w/e 07/01/1967
   Withdrawn 26/05/1968

Components
Fitted Component Details Removed Reason Removed
01/05/1958 Power Unit ER82117    


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
01/05/1958 To Service To service as D3494
Built at Darlington Works
Allocated to March (31B)
   
07/11/1964 Allocation Reallocated to New England (34E)    
10/09/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
10/12/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (30F)    
07/01/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Colchester (30E)    
26/05/1968 Withdrawn Condemned as D3494    
01/01/1969 Scrapped Broken up by Cohens: Kettering    

prev prev