Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 140 Today
» 909 Yesterday
» 140 Week
» 21981 Month
» 217435 Year
» 1101816 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3495 15/05/1958

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 10
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Cost when Built £
To Service 15/05/1958
Withdrawn 22/06/1968
Time in Service 10 yrs, 1 mth , 7 dys
Cut Up 01/01/1969
Cut At C F Booth (Rotherham)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
30A Stratford (New) 15/05/1958
30F Parkeston Quay 4w/e 11/10/1958
16A Toton w/e 17/09/1966
   Withdrawn 22/06/1968

Components
Fitted Component Details Removed Reason Removed
15/05/1958 Power Unit ER82261    


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
15/05/1958 To Service To service as D3495
Built at Darlington Works
Allocated to Stratford (30A)
   
11/10/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (30F)    
17/09/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Toton (16A)    
22/06/1968 Withdrawn Condemned as D3495    
01/01/1969 Scrapped Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham    

prev prev