Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 102 Today
» 924 Yesterday
» 3497 Week
» 19476 Month
» 214930 Year
» 1099311 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3496 05/06/1958

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 10
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Cost when Built £
To Service 05/06/1958
Withdrawn 26/11/1967
Time in Service 9 yrs, 5 mths , 21 dys
Cut Up 01/09/1968
Cut At Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
30A Stratford (New) 05/06/1958
30F Parkeston Quay 5w/e 15/11/1958
30E Colchester w/e 07/01/1967
   Withdrawn 26/11/1967

Components
Fitted Component Details Removed Reason Removed
05/06/1958 Power Unit ER82322    


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
05/06/1958 To Service To service as D3496
Built at Darlington Works
Allocated to Stratford (30A)
   
15/11/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (30F)    
07/01/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Colchester (30E)    
26/11/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as D3496    
01/09/1968 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster    

prev prev