Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 141 Today
» 909 Yesterday
» 141 Week
» 21982 Month
» 217436 Year
» 1101817 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3497 14/12/1957

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 10
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Doncaster Works
Cost when Built £
To Service 14/12/1957
Withdrawn 13/04/1968
Time in Service 10 yrs, 3 mths , 30 dys
Cut Up 01/03/1989
Cut At ECC Ports Ltd (Fowey)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
30A Stratford (New) 14/12/1957
16A Toton w/e 17/09/1966
16B Colwick w/e 11/11/1967
   Withdrawn 13/04/1968


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
14/12/1957 To Service To service as D3497
Built at Doncaster Works
Allocated to Stratford (30A)
   
17/09/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Toton (16A)    
11/11/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (16B)    
13/04/1968 Withdrawn Condemned as D3497    
01/03/1989 Scrapped Broken up by ECC Ports Ltd: Fowey    

prev prev