Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 742 Today
» 820 Yesterday
» 4145 Week
» 21094 Month
» 135355 Year
» 1019736 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3498 21/12/1957

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 10
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Doncaster Works
To Service 21/12/1957
Withdrawn 01/06/1968
Time in Service 10 yrs, 5 mths , 11 dys
Cut Up 01/01/1969
Cut At C F Booth (Rotherham)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
30A Stratford (New) 21/12/1957
16A Toton w/e 17/09/1966
   Withdrawn 01/06/1968


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
21/12/1957 To Service To service as D3498
Built at Doncaster Works
Allocated to Stratford (30A)
   
17/09/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Toton (16A)    
01/06/1968 Withdrawn Condemned as D3498    
01/01/1969 Scrapped Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham    

prev prev