Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 123 Today
» 843 Yesterday
» 2706 Week
» 19655 Month
» 133916 Year
» 1018297 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3500 01/01/1958

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 10
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Doncaster Works
To Service 01/01/1958
Withdrawn 20/01/1968
Time in Service 10 yrs , 19 dys
Cut Up 01/07/1968
Cut At Cashmore's (Great Bridge)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
30A Stratford (New) 01/01/1958
30F Parkeston Quay 4w/e 10/05/1958
30A Stratford 4w/e 19/07/1958
16A Toton w/e 17/09/1966
   Withdrawn 20/01/1968


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
01/01/1958 To Service To service as D3500
Built at Doncaster Works
Allocated to Stratford (30A)
   
10/05/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (30F)    
19/07/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
17/09/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Toton (16A)    
20/01/1968 Withdrawn Condemned as D3500    
01/07/1968 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge    

prev prev