Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 139 Today
» 909 Yesterday
» 139 Week
» 21980 Month
» 217434 Year
» 1101815 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3502 15/01/1958

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 10
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Doncaster Works
Cost when Built £
To Service 15/01/1958
Withdrawn 03/02/1968
Time in Service 10 yrs , 19 dys
Cut Up 01/07/1968
Cut At Cashmore's (Great Bridge)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
30A Stratford (New) 15/01/1958
30F Parkeston Quay 4w/e 12/04/1958
30A Stratford 4w/e 11/10/1958
16A Toton w/e 17/09/1966
   Withdrawn 03/02/1968


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
15/01/1958 To Service To service as D3502
Built at Doncaster Works
Allocated to Stratford (30A)
   
12/04/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (30F)    
11/10/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
17/09/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Toton (16A)    
03/02/1968 Withdrawn Condemned as D3502    
01/07/1968 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge    

prev prev