Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 92 Today
» 1171 Yesterday
» 3709 Week
» 15414 Month
» 346903 Year
» 423490 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3503 14/04/1958
TOPS (Tops) 08388 02/1974

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 08
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Derby Works
To Service 14/04/1958
Withdrawn 20/07/2001
Time in Service 43 yrs, 3 mths , 6 dys
Cut At EMR (Kingsbury)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
82B St Philips Marsh (New) 14/04/1958
82A Bristol Bath Road 4w/e 04/11/1961
82A Bristol Bath Road w/e 29/11/1964
91N To North Eastern Region 9w/e 18/03/1968
51L Thornaby 5w/e 30/03/1968
YK York (North) w/e 09/05/1976
   Withdrawn 20/07/2001

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
0000 Scrapped Broken up by EMR: Kingsbury    
14/04/1958 To Service To service as D3503
Built at Derby Works
Allocated to St Philips Marsh (82B)
   
04/11/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A)    
29/11/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A)    
18/03/1968 Allocation Reallocated to To North Eastern Region (91N)    
30/03/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Thornaby (51L)    
02/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 08388    
09/05/1976 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (YK)    
20/07/2001 Withdrawn Condemned as 08388    

prev prev