Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 7 Online
» 359 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18162 Week
» 71178 Month
» 190705 Year
» 3217558 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3515 |
23/05/1958 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08400 |
03/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
23/05/1958 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
23/05/1958 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3515 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Laira (83D) |
|
|
14/06/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (83D) |
|
|
06/09/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A) |
|
|
15/01/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A) |
|
|
19/06/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Worcester (85A) |
|
|
15/01/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86B) |
|
|
31/03/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (87E) |
|
|
03/05/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08400 |
|
|
21/12/1987 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08400 from Landore (LE) |
|
|
06/11/1990 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Vic Berry: Leicester |
|
|