Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 767 Today
» 1339 Yesterday
» 2106 Week
» 31604 Month
» 368450 Year
» 1590015 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3516 23/05/1958  
TOPS (Tops) 08401 03/1974  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 08
Subclass/Rebuild History
ClassFrom
0823/05/1958
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Derby Works
To Service 23/05/1958 to Laira (83D)
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
83D Laira (New) on 23/05/1958
83D Laira 4w/e 14/06/1958
83E St Blazey 4w/e 27/01/1962
83D Laira 4w/e 01/06/1963
83D Exmouth Junction 7w/e 22/06/1964
83C Westbury 7w/e 07/11/1965
82A Bristol Bath Road 2w/e 15/01/1967
36A Doncaster w/e 10/08/1968


Summary
Start Event Details Source See Also
23/05/1958 To Service To service as British Railways Number D3516
Built at Derby Works
Allocated to Laira (83D)
   
14/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (83D)    
27/01/1962 Allocation Reallocated to St Blazey (83E)    
01/06/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (83D)    
22/06/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (83D)    
07/11/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Westbury (83C)    
15/01/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A)    
10/08/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
03/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 08401 (Tops)    

prev prev