Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 212 Today
» 1253 Yesterday
» 7672 Week
» 5185 Month
» 233069 Year
» 1454634 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3517 23/05/1958  
TOPS (Tops) 08402 04/1974  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 08
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Derby Works
To Service 23/05/1958
Withdrawn 30/09/2008
Time in Service 50 yrs, 4 mths , 7 dys
Cut At T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
83D Laira (New) 23/05/1958
83D Laira 4w/e 14/06/1958
83A Newton Abbot 4w/e 06/09/1958
83C Exeter 4w/e 01/06/1963
83D Exmouth Junction 4w/e 02/11/1963
83D Exmouth Junction 7w/e 22/06/1964
84B St Blazey 4w/e 06/12/1969
82A Bristol Bath Road 9w/e 04/04/1970
BZ St Blazey w/e 22/02/1975
   Withdrawn 30/09/2008

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 83C Exeter 4w/e 01/06/1963
ALLOC 83D Exmouth Junction 5w/e 02/11/1963
ALLOC 84A Laira 2w/e 08/06/1964
ALLOC 84B St Blazey 3w/e 06/12/1969
ALLOC 82A Bristol Bath Road 4w/e 14/03/1970
ALLOC KD Carlisle Kingmoor m/e 31/05/1985

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
0000 Scrapped Broken up by T J Thomson and Son Ltd.: Stockton    
23/05/1958 To Service To service as D3517
Built at Derby Works
Allocated to Laira (83D)
   
14/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (83D)    
06/09/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A)    
01/06/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Exeter (83C)    
02/11/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (83D)    
22/06/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (83D)    
06/12/1969 Allocation Reallocated to St Blazey (84B)    
04/04/1970 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A)    
04/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 08402    
22/02/1975 Allocation Reallocated to St Blazey (BZ)    
30/09/2008 Withdrawn Condemned as 08402    

prev prev