Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 997 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14403 Week
» 67419 Month
» 186946 Year
» 3213799 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3518 |
30/05/1958 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08403 |
05/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
30/05/1958 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
30/05/1958 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3518 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Laira (83D) |
|
|
06/09/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Exeter (83C) |
|
|
27/02/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tyseley (84E) |
|
|
14/07/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stourbridge Junction (84F) |
|
|
12/01/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Reading (W.R.) (81D) |
|
|
09/05/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
21/05/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
26/06/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cricklewood East (14A) |
|
|
05/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08403 |
|
|
11/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bletchley (BY) |
|
|
18/10/1981 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08403 from Bletchley (BY) |
|
|
30/04/1986 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|