Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 304 Today
» 1182 Yesterday
» 4941 Week
» 16234 Month
» 280867 Year
» 1502432 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3518 30/05/1958  
TOPS (Tops) 08403 05/1974  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 08
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Derby Works
To Service 30/05/1958 to Laira (83D)
Withdrawn 18/10/1981 off Bletchley (BY)
Time in Service 23 yrs, 4 mths , 18 dys
Cut Up 30/04/1986
Cut At Locomotive Works (Swindon)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
83D Laira (New) on 30/05/1958
83C Exeter 4w/e 06/09/1958
84E Tyseley 4w/e 27/02/1960
84F Stourbridge Junction 4w/e 14/07/1962
81D Reading (W.R.) 4w/e 12/01/1963
1A Willesden w/e 09/05/1970
81A Old Oak Common 3w/e 21/05/1970
14A Cricklewood East w/e 26/06/1971
   Withdrawn on 18/10/1981


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
30/05/1958 To Service To service as D3518
Built at Derby Works
Allocated to Laira (83D)
   
06/09/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Exeter (83C)    
27/02/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Tyseley (84E)    
14/07/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Stourbridge Junction (84F)    
12/01/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Reading (W.R.) (81D)    
09/05/1970 Allocation Reallocated to Willesden (1A)    
21/05/1970 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A)    
26/06/1971 Allocation Reallocated to Cricklewood East (14A)    
06/02/1972 Sightings Derby Works visit: Around the works - Sidings. RO 4/1972 Link
05/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 08403    
18/10/1981 Withdrawn Condemned as 08403 from Bletchley (BY)    
30/04/1986 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon    

prev prev