Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 118 Today
» 1134 Yesterday
» 3486 Week
» 24388 Month
» 24388 Year
» 1245953 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3520 06/06/1958
TOPS (Tops) 08405 02/02/1974

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 08
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Derby Works
Cost when Built £
To Service 06/06/1958
Status In Service

Allocations
Code Name Date From
83A Newton Abbot (New) 06/06/1958
83D Laira 4w/e 06/09/1958
88M Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 01/06/1963
87A Neath (Court Sart) 4w/e 27/07/1963
87B Margam 6w/e 13/04/1964
40B Immingham w/e 29/03/1969


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
06/06/1958 To Service To service as D3520
Built at Derby Works
Allocated to Newton Abbot (83A)
   
06/09/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (83D)    
01/06/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (88M)    
27/07/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Neath (Court Sart) (87A)    
13/04/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Margam (87B)    
29/03/1969 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
02/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 08405    

prev prev