Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 1008 Today
» 1293 Yesterday
» 7215 Week
» 4728 Month
» 232612 Year
» 1454177 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3521 06/06/1958  
TOPS (Tops) 08406 03/1974  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 08
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Derby Works
To Service 06/06/1958
Withdrawn 20/04/1988 off Cambridge (CA)
Time in Service 29 yrs, 10 mths , 14 dys
Cut Up 01/10/1992
Cut At C F Booth (Rotherham)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
83A Newton Abbot (New) 06/06/1958
83C Exeter 4w/e 06/09/1958
83D Exmouth Junction 4w/e 02/11/1963
84A Laira 10w/e 15/01/1966
85A Worcester 9w/e 09/11/1968
31B March w/e 29/03/1969
   Withdrawn 20/04/1988

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 83D Exmouth Junction 5w/e 02/11/1963
ALLOC 84A Laira 7w/e 16/01/1966
ALLOC 85A Worcester q/e 19/10/1968
ALLOC 31B March w/e 23/03/1969
ALLOC 31B March 3w/e 29/03/1969

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
06/06/1958 To Service To service as D3521
Built at Derby Works
Allocated to Newton Abbot (83A)
   
06/09/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Exeter (83C)    
02/11/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (83D)    
15/01/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (84A)    
09/11/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Worcester (85A)    
29/03/1969 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
03/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 08406    
20/04/1988 Withdrawn Condemned as 08406 from Cambridge (CA)    
01/10/1992 Scrapped Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham    

prev prev