Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 835 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14241 Week
» 67257 Month
» 186784 Year
» 3213637 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3522 |
06/06/1958 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08407 |
04/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
06/06/1958 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/06/1958 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3522 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Newton Abbot (83A) |
|
|
06/09/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (83D) |
|
|
01/11/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Exeter (83C) |
|
|
01/06/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (83D) |
|
|
04/05/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Taunton (83B) |
|
|
20/07/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Barnstaple Junction (83F) |
|
|
31/05/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A) |
|
|
26/04/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08407 |
|
|
01/02/1993 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08407 from Stratford (SF) |
|
|
03/12/1993 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Gwent Demolition: Margam |
|
|