Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 27 Online
» 1616 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15022 Week
» 68038 Month
» 187565 Year
» 3214418 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3527 |
20/06/1958 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08412 |
02/02/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
20/06/1958 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
20/06/1958 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3527 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Truro (83F) |
|
|
09/08/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88B) |
|
|
29/11/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Barry (88C) |
|
|
27/12/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88B) |
|
|
03/11/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (88M) |
|
|
29/11/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
19/09/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Southall (81C) |
|
|
01/05/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
09/11/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
07/12/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
02/02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08412 |
|
|
24/11/1985 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08412 from March (MR) |
|
|
30/10/1992 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|