Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 68 Today
» 1145 Yesterday
» 6114 Week
» 25759 Month
» 60401 Year
» 1281966 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3527 20/06/1958
TOPS (Tops) 08412 02/02/1974

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 08
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Derby Works
Cost when Built £
To Service 20/06/1958
Withdrawn 24/11/1985 off March (MR)
Time in Service 27 yrs, 5 mths , 4 dys
Cut Up 30/10/1992
Cut At C F Booth (Rotherham)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
83F Truro (New) 20/06/1958
88B Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 09/08/1958
88C Barry 4w/e 29/11/1958
88B Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 27/12/1958
88M Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 03/11/1962
86A Cardiff Canton w/e 29/11/1964
81C Southall 6w/e 19/09/1965
86A Cardiff Canton 5w/e 01/05/1966
86A Cardiff Canton 9w/e 09/11/1968
31B March w/e 07/12/1968
   Withdrawn 24/11/1985


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
20/06/1958 To Service To service as D3527
Built at Derby Works
Allocated to Truro (83F)
   
09/08/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88B)    
29/11/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Barry (88C)    
27/12/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88B)    
03/11/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (88M)    
29/11/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A)    
19/09/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Southall (81C)    
01/05/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A)    
09/11/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A)    
07/12/1968 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
02/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 08412    
24/11/1985 Withdrawn Condemned as 08412 from March (MR)    
30/10/1992 Scrapped Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham    

prev prev