Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 8 Online
» 165 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17968 Week
» 70984 Month
» 190511 Year
» 3217364 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3530 |
04/07/1958 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08415 |
05/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
08 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
04/07/1958 to Yoker (65G) |
Withdrawn |
30/09/1996 |
Time in Service |
38 yrs, 2 mths , 26 dys |
Cut Up |
10/1995 |
Cut At |
EMR (Sheffield) |
Status |
Scrapped |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
04/07/1958 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Works Visits
Where Repaired |
Date Stopped |
Days Since Last Stopped |
Works Entry |
Departure |
Class of Repair |
Waiting Repair Decision |
Waiting Works |
On Works |
Total Duration |
Cost of Repair |
Mileage |
Notes |
St. Rollox Works |
|
n/a |
06/01/1965 |
22/01/1965 |
Intermediate |
|
|
|
17 days |
|
|
|
St. Rollox Works |
|
n/a |
06/01/1965 |
22/01/1965 |
Intermediate |
|
|
|
17 days |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/07/1958 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3530 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Yoker (65G) |
|
|
27/09/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kipps (65E) |
|
|
22/10/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
06/01/1965 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - St. Rollox Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 06/01/1965. Dep: 22/01/1965. |
|
|
06/01/1965 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - St. Rollox Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 06/01/1965. Dep: 22/01/1965. |
|
|
05/11/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lostock Hall (10D) |
|
|
18/09/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A) |
|
|
05/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08415 |
|
|
10/1995 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by EMR: Sheffield |
|
|
30/09/1996 |
Withdrawn |
|
|
|