Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 1138 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18941 Week
» 71957 Month
» 191484 Year
» 3218337 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3532 |
04/07/1958 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08417 |
20/11/1973 |
|
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
06/1982 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
06/1982 |
|
Vacuum Brakes removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
04/07/1958 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
06/1982 |
a |
Air brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/07/1958 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3532 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Beattock (68D) |
|
|
27/09/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dawsholm (65D) |
|
|
24/11/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
27/01/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dunfermline Upper (62C) |
|
|
30/11/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) |
|
|
04/01/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) |
|
|
08/01/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
20/11/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08417 |
|
|
06/1982 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
06/1982 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Brakes removed |
|
|