Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 2171 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19974 Week
» 72990 Month
» 192517 Year
» 3219370 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3537 |
08/08/1958 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08422 |
03/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
08/08/1958 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/08/1958 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3537 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Stirling (63B) |
|
|
26/11/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Grangemouth (65F) |
|
|
28/12/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) |
|
|
01/02/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) |
|
|
01/03/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To Eastern Region (91E) |
|
|
08/01/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08422 |
|
|
09/12/1985 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08422 from Bletchley (BY) |
|
|
07/1988 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Birds: Long Marston |
|
|