Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 704 Today
» 1081 Yesterday
» 2819 Week
» 25325 Month
» 328515 Year
» 1550080 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3539 15/08/1958  
TOPS (Tops) 08424 12/1974  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 08
Subclass/Rebuild History
ClassFrom
0815/08/1958
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Derby Works
To Service 15/08/1958 to Stirling (63B)
Withdrawn 10/06/1985 off Thornton Junction (TJ)
Time in Service 26 yrs, 9 mths , 26 dys
Cut Up 31/12/1985
Cut At J R Adams (Glasgow)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
63B Stirling (New) on 15/08/1958
65F Grangemouth 9w/e 26/11/1966
61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 5w/e 01/01/1972
DE Dundee West 4w/e 29/12/1973
   Withdrawn on 10/06/1985


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
15/08/1958 To Service To service as D3539
Built at Derby Works
Allocated to Stirling (63B)
   
26/11/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Grangemouth (65F)    
12/07/1969 Sightings Grangemouth depot: On shed RO 9/1969 Link
01/01/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)    
29/12/1973 Allocation Reallocated to Dundee West (DE)    
12/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 08424    
10/06/1985 Withdrawn Condemned as 08424 from Thornton Junction (TJ)    
31/12/1985 Scrapped Broken up by J R Adams: Glasgow    

prev prev