Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 293 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18096 Week
» 71112 Month
» 190639 Year
» 3217492 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3541 |
22/08/1958 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08426 |
12/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
by 05/1971 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
22/08/1958 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
22/08/1958 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3541 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Perth South (63A) |
|
|
01/08/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dundee West (62B) |
|
|
05/1971 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
|
|
27/01/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dundee West (62B) |
|
|
12/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08426 |
|
|
02/07/1976 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08426 from Dundee West (DE) |
|
|
05/1977 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|