Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 31 Online
» 3659 Today
» 4916 Yesterday
» 13233 Week
» 78187 Month
» 280851 Year
» 3307704 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3542 |
29/08/1958 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08427 |
04/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
by 11/1970 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 12/1975 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
by 04/1978 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
29/08/1958 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
29/08/1958 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3542 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Perth South (63A) |
|
|
28/12/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) |
|
|
01/02/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
01/03/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To Eastern Region (91E) |
|
|
11/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08427 |
|
|
12/1975 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
04/1978 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
|
|
14/11/1986 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08427 from March (MR) |
|
|
25/03/1994 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Gwent Demolition: Margam |
|
|