Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 761 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18564 Week
» 71580 Month
» 191107 Year
» 3217960 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3545 |
05/09/1958 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08430 |
09/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
05/09/1958 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/09/1958 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3545 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Perth South (63A) |
|
|
01/08/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dundee West (62B) |
|
|
01/04/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
28/10/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
29/12/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ayr (AY) |
|
|
09/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08430 |
|
|
18/12/1985 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08430 from Eastfield (ED) |
|
|
05/1986 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by J McWilliams: Shettleston |
|
|