Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 1585 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19388 Week
» 72404 Month
» 191931 Year
» 3218784 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3546 |
12/09/1958 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08431 |
02/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
12/09/1958 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/09/1958 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3546 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B) |
|
|
01/07/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kittybrewster (61A) |
|
|
29/01/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Leith Central (64H) |
|
|
19/08/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (16C) |
|
|
26/08/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To London Midland Region (91M) |
|
|
09/09/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
11/05/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Allerton (8J) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08431 |
|
|
04/07/1985 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08431 from Allerton (AN) |
|
|
09/1987 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Texas Metals: at Allerton MPD |
|
|