Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 1959 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19762 Week
» 72778 Month
» 192305 Year
» 3219158 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3547 |
19/09/1958 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08432 |
02/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
19/09/1958 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
19/09/1958 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3547 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B) |
|
|
01/07/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kittybrewster (61A) |
|
|
30/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) |
|
|
25/02/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Leith Central (64H) |
|
|
28/10/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
29/03/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornton Junction (62A) |
|
|
31/05/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornton Junction (62A) |
|
|
29/11/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Leith Central (64H) |
|
|
28/02/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A) |
|
|
16/01/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (55F) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08432 |
|
|
16/10/1983 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08432 from Bradford Hammerton Street (HS) |
|
|
28/01/1984 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|