Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 173 Today
» 1180 Yesterday
» 5927 Week
» 33885 Month
» 68527 Year
» 1290092 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3547 19/09/1958
TOPS (Tops) 08432 02/1974

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 08
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Derby Works
Cost when Built £
To Service 19/09/1958
Withdrawn 16/10/1983 off Bradford Hammerton Street (HS)
Time in Service 25 yrs , 27 dys
Cut Up 28/01/1984
Cut At Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
61B Aberdeen Ferryhill (New) 19/09/1958
61A Kittybrewster 4w/e 01/07/1961
64A St Margarets 5w/e 30/04/1966
64H Leith Central 4w/e 25/02/1967
65A Eastfield 4w/e 28/10/1967
62A Thornton Junction 4w/e 29/03/1969
62A Thornton Junction 5w/e 31/05/1969
64H Leith Central 4w/e 29/11/1969
55A Holbeck (MR) w/e 28/02/1970
55F Bradford Hammerton Street w/e 16/01/1971
   Withdrawn 16/10/1983


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
19/09/1958 To Service To service as D3547
Built at Derby Works
Allocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)
   
01/07/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Kittybrewster (61A)    
30/04/1966 Allocation Reallocated to St Margarets (64A)    
25/02/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Leith Central (64H)    
28/10/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Eastfield (65A)    
29/03/1969 Allocation Reallocated to Thornton Junction (62A)    
31/05/1969 Allocation Reallocated to Thornton Junction (62A)    
29/11/1969 Allocation Reallocated to Leith Central (64H)    
28/02/1970 Allocation Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A)    
16/01/1971 Allocation Reallocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (55F)    
02/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 08432    
16/10/1983 Withdrawn Condemned as 08432 from Bradford Hammerton Street (HS)    
28/01/1984 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster    

prev prev