Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 881 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18684 Week
» 71700 Month
» 191227 Year
» 3218080 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3548 |
26/09/1958 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08433 |
04/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
26/09/1958 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
26/09/1958 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3548 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B) |
|
|
01/07/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kittybrewster (61A) |
|
|
30/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) |
|
|
25/02/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Leith Central (64H) |
|
|
01/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Inverness (60A) |
|
|
28/02/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Leith Central (64H) |
|
|
27/05/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08433 |
|
|
27/04/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ayr (AY) |
|
|
17/03/1986 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08433 from Thornton Junction (TJ) |
|
|
05/1986 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by J McWilliams: Shettleston |
|
|